FL S1656 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting domestic wastewater treatment facilities from disposing of effluent, reclaimed water, or reuse water by surface water discharge beginning on a specified date; providing that reclaimed water is a water source for public water supply systems; providing specified groundwater and surface water quality protections for potable reuse projects; requiring counties, municipalities, and special districts to authorize graywater technologies under certain circumstances and to provide incentives for the implementation of such technologies; providing requirements for the use of graywater technologies, etc.
Title
Reclaimed Water
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee | Sen. Ben Albritton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H715 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S712 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-150
S712 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-150
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 8531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 892 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |