FL S1654 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2014-40), HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2014-40), HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain real property improvements and tangible personal property additions to occur within a specified period in order to qualify for a specified ad valorem tax exemption; providing that charges for the storage of towed vehicles that are impounded by a local, state, or federal law enforcement agency are not taxable; providing monetary and criminal penalties for a dealer's willful failure to collect certain taxes or fees after receiving notice of such duty to collect from the Department of Revenue, etc.
Title
Tax Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2014-40), HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7081 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | CS by- Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/17/14, 4:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | SPB 7066 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1654) by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H7081 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-40, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5601 (Ch. 2014-38)
H5601 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-38, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 805 (Ch. 2014-132), HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2014-40)
H5601 (Similar To) 2014-05-14 - Chapter No. 2014-38, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 805 (Ch. 2014-132), HB 5001 (Ch. 2014-51), CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2014-40)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
196 | 1995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 0535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 295 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |