FL S1652 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1297 (Ch. 2016-146)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1297 (Ch. 2016-146)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a county to apply proceeds of a pension liability surtax toward reducing the unfunded liability of a defined benefit retirement plan or system; authorizing a county to levy a pension liability surtax by ordinance if certain conditions are met; specifying the manner in which a local government may use the surtax proceeds, etc.
Title
Discretionary Sales Surtaxes
Sponsors
Senate Finance and Tax Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. Rob Bradley [R] | Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1297 (Ch. 2016-146) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1297 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (553686) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/24/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-02-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/16, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Finance and Tax; Rules |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1297 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-146
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |