FL S1642 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting the requirement that a physician be physically present in the same room when informing a pregnant woman of specified information for purposes of obtaining informed consent for termination of a pregnancy; deleting the requirement that such information be provided within a specified timeframe; deleting the requirement that a physician perform an ultrasound on a pregnant woman and inform her of the probable gestational age of the fetus for purposes of obtaining informed consent for a termination of pregnancy, etc.
Title
Informed Consent for Termination Of Pregnancy
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6023 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S628 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S628 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 01112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1642 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1642/BillText/Filed/HTML |