FL S1642 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to review and revise the Cuban Adjustment Act of 1966, etc.
Title
Cuban Adjustment Act of 1966
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died on Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Temporarily postponed on 2nd reading; On Unfinished Business |
2016-03-07 | House | Amendment temporarily postponed (189611) |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted for CS/HM 959 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | In Messages |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Adopted as amended |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (404648) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/17/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/08/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Rules |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0959 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table