FL S1642 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1720 (Ch. 2013-51)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1720 (Ch. 2013-51)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transferring oversight of the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute to the Board of Trustees of the University of South Florida; requiring the Board of Trustees to enter into a lease agreement for use of certain land and facilities; requiring the University of South Florida and the Florida not-for-profit corporation that governs and operates the H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute to enter into an agreement to review construction plans and specifications for consistency of certain criteria; providing for the governance and operation of the facilities if the agreement between the not-for-profit corporation and the Board of Trustees of the University of South Florida, rather than the Board of Governors, is terminated, etc.
Title
H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center and Research Institute
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1720 (Ch. 2013-51) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Education; Rules |
2013-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7057 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1076 (Ch. 2013-27), CS/CS/SB 1720 (Ch. 2013-51)
S1720 (Similar To) 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-51, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1076 (Ch. 2013-27), SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
S1720 (Similar To) 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-51, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1076 (Ch. 2013-27), SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1642 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1642/BillText/Filed/HTML |