FL S1642 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Approved by Governor -SJ 00617; Chapter No. 2010-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Approved by Governor -SJ 00617; Chapter No. 2010-19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Re-creates the Emergency Response Trust Fund within the Department of Military Affairs without modification. Abrogates the provisions relating to the termination of the trust fund, to conform.
Title
Emergency Response Trust Fund/Military Affairs [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - House - House Roll Call No. 0629 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0016 - Trust Fund Bills (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0016 - Trust Fund Bills (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Approved by Governor -SJ 00617; Chapter No. 2010-19 | |
2010-04-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -SJ 00576 | |
2010-03-31 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00407 | |
2010-03-24 | Substituted for HB 7147 -HJ 00391; Read 2nd time -HJ 00391; Read 3rd time -HJ 00391; CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00392 | |
2010-03-19 | Received -HJ 00346; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00346 | |
2010-03-18 | In Messages | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00267; Read 3rd time -SJ 00267; CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 00267; Immediately certified -SJ 00267 | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00191 | |
2010-03-04 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-03 | CS by- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00191; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00245 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations -SJ 00113; On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 03/03/10, 8:30 am, 309-C | |
2010-02-26 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations, 03/03/10, 8:30 am, 309-C | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations | |
2010-02-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7147 (Similar To) 2010-03-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1642; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1642 (Ch. 2010-19) -HJ 00391