FL S1634 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Parents' Bill of Rights"; providing that the state, its political subdivisions, other governmental entities, or other institutions may not infringe on parental rights without demonstrating specified information; providing that a parent of a minor child has specified rights relating to his or her minor child; requiring each district school board in consultation with parents, teachers, and administrators, to develop and adopt a policy to promote parental involvement in the public school system; prohibiting certain health care practitioners from taking specified actions without a parent's written permission, etc.
Title
Parental Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Now in Education |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Education; Rules |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1059 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1014 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 813 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |