FL S1624 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Southeast Florida Coral Reef Ecosystem Conservation Area, etc.
Title
Coral Reefs
Sponsors
Senate Environmental Preservation and Conservation Committee | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/28/17, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1143 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation