FL S1620 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting from public records requirements a respondent's name in certain documents at trial and on appeal; expanding the exemption from public records requirements for certain petitions, court orders, and related records regarding persons with potential mental, emotional, and behavioral disorders to include certain examinations and applications; expanding exceptions authorizing the release or use of such applications, petitions, orders, records, and identifying information to include certain persons and entities; revising the date for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Court Records
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1313 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6760 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1620 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1620/BillText/Filed/HTML |