FL S1616 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56), CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56), CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring county and municipal budget officers, respectively, to submit certain information to the Office of Economic and Demographic Research within a specified timeframe; requiring adopted budget amendments and final budgets to remain posted on each entity's official website for a specified period of time, etc.
Title
Local Government Financial Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56), CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substituted HB 861 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H861 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Chapter No. 2019-56, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15)
H7035 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15), HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56)
S7014 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-15, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56)
H7035 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15), HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56)
S7014 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-15, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
129 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1616 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1616/BillText/Filed/HTML |