FL H7035 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15), HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15), HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that Governor, Commissioner of Education, or designee may notify Legislative Auditing Committee of entity's failure to comply with auditing & financial reporting requirements; revises provisions relating to audits; requires entities to maintain budget documents on entities' websites; specifies applicable standards as to employee background screening & investigations of Florida College System & State University System personnel.
Title
Government Accountability
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15), HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56) |
2019-04-10 | House | Substituted CS/SB 7014 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-29 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2019-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-28 | House | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-21 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 03/21/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7014 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-15, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56)
H861 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Chapter No. 2019-56, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15)
S1616 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56), CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15)
H861 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Chapter No. 2019-56, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15)
S1616 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 861 (Ch. 2019-56), CS/SB 7014 (Ch. 2019-15)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1010 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 8551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 915 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 86 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 985 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |