FL S1608 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that an applicant who has maintained his or her dental license in good standing in another state for a specified number of years immediately before applying to take the licensing examinations to practice dentistry in this state is entitled to take such examinations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dentistry

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-07 On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Amendments adopted-Temporarily postponed
2011-03-30 On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-03-09 Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 178
2011-03-03 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1271 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
466006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback