FL H1271 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that applicants licensed to practice dentistry in other states are entitled to take licensure examinations for licensure in this state; provides for expiration.
Title
Dentistry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee, 03/23/11, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 221 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 115 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1608 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
466 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1271 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1271/BillText/Filed/HTML |