FL S1604 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain organizations providing child care to school-age children to be licensed as child care facilities; removing a requirement to adopt a definition by rule, etc.
Title
Licensure of Child Care Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1604 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1604/BillText/Filed/HTML |