FL S1598 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1217
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating provisions entitled "Uniform Deployed Parents Custody and Visitation Act"; providing requirements for proceeding for custodial responsibility of a child of a servicemember; authorizing a court to grant caretaking authority or limited contact to a nonparent under certain conditions; providing for the termination of a grant of authority; authorizing a court to modify or terminate a temporary grant of custodial responsibility, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deployed Parent Custody and Visitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1217
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 1217
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-08SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2018-02-08SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-07SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-01SenateFavorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-30SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/01/18, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-29SenateNow in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2018-01-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1217 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-69

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6113002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61705Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61721Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61729Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61737Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61739Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61741Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61743Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61747Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61749Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61761Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61763Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61773Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback