FL S1594 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1337 922
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1337 922
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring any nurse desiring to be licensed as an advanced practice registered nurse to apply to the Department of Health, submit proof that he or she holds a current license to practice professional nursing, and meet one or more specified requirements as determined by the Board of Nursing; authorizing the board to adopt rules to provide for provisional state licensure of certified nurse midwives, certified nurse practitioners, certified registered nurse anesthetists, clinical nurse specialists, and psychiatric nurses for a specified period of time; authorizing certain certified practitioners to continue practicing advanced nursing during a specified period of time, etc.
Title
Nursing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1337 922 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1337 922 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Favorable by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-01-31 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/30/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1337 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-106
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
310 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00593 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
384 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 0191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 427 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 679 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 6793 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 487 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9974 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9976 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9979 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 445 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 918 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0392 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 3265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
458 | 348 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 0137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
459 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 0205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
467 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 0475 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
483 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
486 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
490 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
491 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 357 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 1116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
90 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |