FL S1588 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying procedures to be followed by certain entities in preparing and approving their operating budgets; requiring certain budget information to be submitted to the legislative appropriations committees; requiring certain entities to establish and maintain a website, etc.
Title
Budget Transparency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7057 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1588 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1588/BillText/Filed/HTML |