FL S1574 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 27 (Ch. 2023-300)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 27 (Ch. 2023-300)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Judgment Lien Improvement Act"; specifying that payment intangibles, accounts, and the proceeds thereof are subject to judgment liens; providing that certain judgment creditors are subject to specified priority of conflicting rights of a secured party; providing construction relating to the effect of liens existing before a specified date on payment intangibles and accounts and the proceeds thereof; requiring a court, under certain circumstances, to order the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to note certain liens on the certificate of title of certain motor vehicles or vessels and in the department's records, etc.
Title
Judgment Liens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 27 (Ch. 2023-300) |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 27 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Rules |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Banking and Insurance |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H27 (Same As) 2023-06-29 - Chapter No. 2023-300
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
319 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
56 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |