FL S1570 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for an application for a permit to remove, cut, or trim trees or vegetation around a sign. Requires that the application include a vegetation management plan, a mitigation contribution to a trust fund, or a combination of both. Requires the Department of Transportation to provide notice to the sign owner of beautification projects or vegetation planting. Creates the tourist-oriented commerce signs pilot program. Exempts commercial signs that meet certain criteria from permit requirements, etc.
Title
Billboard Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/26/11, 9:45 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 -SJ 322 | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/04/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 260 | |
2011-03-21 | Original reference(s) removed: Commerce and Tourism | |
2011-03-18 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-16 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 236 | |
2011-03-11 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/16/11, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Transportation; Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 176 | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
479 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |