FL S1552 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a citizen support organization for Florida Missing Children's Day to provide grants to law enforcement agencies for specified purposes; authorizing sexual predators and sexual offenders to report online certain information to the Department of Law Enforcement; requiring the Chief of Domestic Security to oversee the development of a statewide strategy for targeted violence prevention, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Activities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Messages
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-28SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-27SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-02-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/25/20, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1055 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
S7028 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
683231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430435Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback