FL S1550 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the DJJ to adopt rules governing the procedures that may be used to restrain a child upon his or her arrival at the courthouse and the length of time a child may be placed in isolation. Requires that a juvenile justice circuit board and a juvenile justice county council be established in each judicial circuit and county, respectively. Requires the Children and Youth Cabinet to monitor the comprehensive plan of each circuit, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice [SPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00109
2010-02-10 Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
2010-01-29 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0242 (Similar To) 2010-03-18 - Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00268; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00268
S1714 (Similar To) 2010-04-16 - Withdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 00635; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00635
S2588 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
098535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0985483Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0985664Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0985668Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0985676Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback