FL S1516 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00004; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the property appraiser to physically inspect any parcel of state-owned real property upon the request of the taxpayer or owner. Requires the DMS to maintain an automated inventory of all facilities owned, leased, rented, or otherwise occupied or maintained by any agency of the state, the judicial branch, or a water management district. Implements the comprehensive state-owned real property system, etc. APPROPRIATION: $320,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-owned Lands [WPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0038 - Conference Committee Report (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - House Roll Call No. 1134 - Passage (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House Roll Call No. 0692 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0009 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-20 Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00004; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
2010-05-28 Vetoed by Governor
2010-05-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-30 Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 01586
2010-04-30 In returning messages; Conference Committee Report received -HJ 01674; Conference Committee Report adopted -HJ 01674; Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 01678
2010-04-30 Conference Committee Report received -SJ 01193; Conference Committee Report adopted -SJ 01197; Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report (179258); YEAS 37 NAYS 2 -SJ 01197
2010-04-19 Conference Committee appointed: Rivera, Flores, Bullard, Clarke-Reed, Coley, Fresen, Kiar, Legg, Stargel, Proctor, Brise, Burgin, Jones, McKeel, O'Toole, Reed, Glorioso, Gibson, Jenne, Horner, Hukill, Murzin, Rogers, Schenck, Adams, Eisnaugle, Holder, Kreegel, Porth, Rouson, Soto, Tobia, Hays, Abruzzo, Braynon, Gonzalez, Nelson, Ray, Workman, Williams, A., Grimsley, Chestnut, Ford, Frishe, Hudson, Roberson, Y., Skidmore, Thompson, N., Poppell, Bembry, Boyd, Brandenburg, Crisafulli, Plakon, Precourt, Williams, T., Bogdanoff, Aubuchon, Bernard, Carroll, Dorworth, Patronis, Fitzgerald, Thurston, Galvano, Gibbons, Hasner, Lopez-Cantera, Reagan, Sands, Thompson, G., Weatherford, McBurney -HJ 00735
2010-04-16 Conference Committee appointed: Senators Alexander, Chair; Haridopolos, Vice Chair; Altman, Bennett, Justice, Ring, Storms, At Large; Criminal & Civil Justice: Crist, Chair; Jones, Joyner, Villalobos, Wilson; Education Pre-K-12: Wise, Chair; Bullard, Detert, Garcia, Richter, Siplin; General Government: Baker, Chair; Aronberg, Dean, Lawson, Oelrich; Health & Human Services: Peaden, Chair; Gaetz, Haridopolos, Negron, Rich, Sobel; Higher Education: Lynn, Chair; Constantine, Gelber, Thrasher; Trans & Econ Development: Fasano, Chair; Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Gardiner, Hill, Smith -SJ 00648
2010-04-06 In returning messages
2010-04-06 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00505; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00506; Read 3rd time -HJ 00508; CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 00508; Immediately certified -HJ 00526; Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference -HJ 00526
2010-04-01 Received -HJ 00473; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00473
2010-03-31 In Messages
2010-03-31 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00384; Amendment(s) adopted (780050) -SJ 00384; Read 3rd time -SJ 00385; CS passed as amended (780050); YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00385; Immediately certified -SJ 00385; Requests House concur or failing to concur appoint conference cmte -SJ 00407
2010-03-30 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00351
2010-03-26 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-25 CS/CS by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 -SJ 00351; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00359
2010-03-22 Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00308; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/25/10, 1:30 pm, 412-K
2010-03-19 CS by General Government Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00280; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00292; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-03-16 On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 03/19/10, 8:30 am, 401-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00107
2010-02-03 Referred to General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules
2010-01-27 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H7169 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
S1752 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-147; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 173 (Ch. 2010-128), CS/HB 969 (Ch. 2010-222), CS/CS/HB 1389 (Ch. 2010-226), CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/HB 7205 (Ch. 2010-140), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208)
S1238 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
H1509 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1752; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7109 (Ch. 2010-136), CS/SB 1118 (Ch. 2010-208), CS/SB 1752 (Ch. 2010-147) -HJ 01135

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0193023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0193085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0213053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
02160152Amended CodeSee Bill Text
02160153New CodeSee Bill Text
025303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0253034Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1516&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1516.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1516c1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1516c2.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1516e1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1516e2.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1516er.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB15160331100009.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/hSB15160406100692.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/hSB15160430101134.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB15160430100038.html

Bill Comments

feedback