FL S1508 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Postsecondary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Postsecondary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the program within the Department of Education for assistant state attorneys and assistant public defenders; providing procedures for payments; requiring payments to be contingent upon proof of eligibility and annual recertification through an annual certification affidavit; requiring the department to reduce payments for all program participants by a proportional amount if appropriated funds are insufficient to provide maximum payment for all program participants' loans, etc.
Title
Assistant State Attorney and Assistant Public Defender Student Loan Repayment Program
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Education Postsecondary |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1213 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1508 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1508/BillText/Filed/HTML |