FL H1213 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes program within DOE; provides purpose of program; requires DOE to administer program; provides eligibility requirements; provides procedures for payments; provides payments are not considered taxable income; requires DOE to reduce payments for all program participants by proportional amount if appropriated funds are insufficient to provide maximum payment for all participants' loans.
Title
Assistant State Attorney and Assistant Public Defender Student Loan Repayment Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-06 | House | Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee |
2023-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1508 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Postsecondary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1213 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1213/BillText/Filed/PDF |