FL S1506 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1387 (Ch. 2023-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1387 (Ch. 2023-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain research in this state relating to enhanced potential pandemic pathogens; prohibiting medical marijuana treatment centers from producing marijuana products that are attractive to children or manufactured in specified manners; requiring local registrars to electronically file all live birth, death, and fetal death records in their respective jurisdictions in the department's electronic registration system; revising the types of health care practitioners who may make certain determinations of death; extending the timeframe for the confidentiality of certain birth records; requiring that hearing aids provided to persons younger than 18 years of age be prescription hearing aids and not over-the-counter hearing aids, etc.
Title
Department of Health
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1387 (Ch. 2023-71) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1387 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Rules |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1387 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-71
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
382 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 2701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 272 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
464 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1246 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 1275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 0401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 0445 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 0501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 0512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 0513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
484 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |