FL H1387 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain research relating to enhanced potential pandemic pathogens; provides requirement for researchers applying for state or local funding; prohibits medical marijuana treatment centers from producing certain marijuana products; provides requirements for marijuana packaging & labeling, medical marijuana treatment center advertising, & medical marijuana testing laboratories & employee background screening; provides requirements for live birth, death, & fetal death records & marriage licenses & certain dissolution-of-marriage records; revises requirements for applicants for certification or recertification as EMT or paramedic; exempts certain applicants for certification as certified nursing assistant from portion of competency examination; revises scope of practice for audiologists & hearing aid specialists; revises membership requirements for members of Board of Hearing Aid Specialists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#57 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#491 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#46 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#330 (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12 Chapter No. 2023-71
2023-05-11 Approved by Governor
2023-05-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2023-05-04HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2023-05-04HouseIn Messages
2023-05-04SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 11
2023-05-04SenateReceded from 1 amendment(s) (509046)
2023-05-04SenateIn returning messages
2023-05-04HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
2023-05-04HouseRefused to concur, requested Senate to recede
2023-05-04HouseAmendment 509046 Refuse to Concur
2023-05-04HouseAmendment 336516 Concur
2023-05-04HouseAdded to Senate Message List
2023-05-04HouseIn Messages
2023-05-04SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2023-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-04SenateAmendment(s) adopted (336516, 509046)
2023-05-04SenateRead 2nd time
2023-05-04SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1506
2023-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-05-04SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2023-04-28SenateReceived
2023-04-28SenateReferred to Rules
2023-04-28SenateIn Messages
2023-04-28HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 93, NAYS 14
2023-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2023-04-28HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2023-04-28HouseAmendment 537621 adopted
2023-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-25HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
2023-04-12HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2023-04-12HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2023-04-12House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2023-04-11HouseCS Filed
2023-04-11HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-04-11HouseReported out of Health & Human Services Committee
2023-04-10HouseFavorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
2023-04-06HouseAdded to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
2023-04-05House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2023-04-05HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2023-04-05HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2023-04-05HouseOriginal reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-04-04HouseCS Filed
2023-04-04HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-04-04HouseReported out of Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
2023-04-03HouseFavorable with CS by Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
2023-03-30HouseAdded to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-09HouseNow in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1506 (Same As) 2023-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1387 (Ch. 2023-71)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381875Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4012701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401272Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40134Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4681225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4681245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4681246Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4681255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4681265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4681275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4840401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
484041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
484042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
484044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4840445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
484045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4840501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
484051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4840512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4840513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
484053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
484054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
484059Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Amendment/098855/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Amendment/876737/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Amendment/068445/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Amendment/537621/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Amendment/535021/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Analyses/h1387.HRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Analyses/h1387a.HRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Analyses/h1387b.HRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Analyses/h1387c.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Analyses/h1387d.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Analyses/2023h01387.hms.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Analyses/h1387z.HRS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=68587&IsPCB=0&BillId=78237
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=68650&IsPCB=0&BillId=78237
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Vote/HouseVote_h01387c2330.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Vote/SenateVote_h01387e1046.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Vote/HouseVote_h01387e1491.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1387/Vote/SenateVote_h01387e1057.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback