FL S1502 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment for certain human trafficking offenses; redefining the term "adult entertainment establishment" to include businesses that restrict admission to adults which feature a person who engages in certain activities for observation by a patron; prohibiting the assessment of fees against victims of human trafficking who seek expungement of certain criminal history records, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7039 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
847 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0582 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1502 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1502/BillText/Filed/HTML |