FL H7039 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides mandatory minimum sentence for certain human trafficking offenses; expands definition of term "adult theater"; prohibits assessing certain fees & costs to victims of human trafficking seeking criminal records expungement.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Ross Spano [R] | Rep. Larry Metz [R] | Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#760 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2018-03-05 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 851 |
2018-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/27/18, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2018-02-06 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/06/18, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1502 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
450 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
847 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0582 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0583 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |