FL S1500 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain health insurance identification cards to include specified information in a certain manner, etc.
Title
Health Insurance Identification Cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1545 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 4302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1500 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1500/BillText/Filed/HTML |