FL H1545 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires prescription drug benefits-ID cards from health insurers, health maintenance organizations, & government entities to contain & display information on types of plan; requires ID cards from individual health insurers, health insurers & HMOs to contain & display information on types of plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance Identification Cards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-27 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseDied in Commerce Committee
2023-03-27HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2023-03-27HouseReported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-03-27HouseFavorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-03-23HouseAdded to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-09HouseNow in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2023-03-09HouseReferred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1500 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6274302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627642Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627657Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback