FL S1480 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for review of the FHSAA's performance of duties; requiring the Florida High School Athletic Association (FHSAA) to adopt guidelines, provide resources, and develop training courses relating to sports ethics; establishing guiding principles for extracurricular activities; revising insurance requirements to include students who participate in nonathletic extracurricular activities, etc.
Title
Extracurricular Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 6 NAYS 5 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/15/15, 5:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7137 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S0948 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
S0948 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |