FL S1476 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to the prohibition of registration of firearms and the treatment of electronic records, etc.
Title
Prohibited Recordkeeping of Firearms or Firearm Owners
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 0625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1476 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1476/BillText/Filed/HTML |