FL S1468 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Auditor General to conduct annual audits of the Florida School for the Deaf and the Blind; revising student eligibility requirements for the Florida Virtual School and virtual instruction programs; creating the Early Childhood Music Education Incentive Pilot Program within the Department of Education for a specified period, etc.
Title
Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 833 (Died on Calendar in Senate) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/17 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 04/18/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education |
2017-04-05 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S824 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H1365 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
S2502 (Similar To) 2017-06-05 - Chapter No. 2017-71, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 865 (Ch. 2017-42), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S2516 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H5003 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71), SB 2508 (Ch. 2017-127)
S692 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H773 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H833 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
S868 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H1365 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
S2502 (Similar To) 2017-06-05 - Chapter No. 2017-71, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 865 (Ch. 2017-42), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
S2516 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Conference Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), CS/CS/SB 890 (Ch. 2017-75), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H5003 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71), SB 2508 (Ch. 2017-127)
S692 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H773 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H833 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
S868 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 498 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |