FL S1466 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Emergency Management to include a qualified interpreter in emergency broadcasts, etc.
Title
State Emergency Communications and Warning System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/25/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1109 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H7083 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
H7083 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security