FL H7083 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends number of days that certain state employees may be granted administrative leave to participate in federal disaster relief services; authorizes Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Funds to be used for specified purposes; provides specified requirements for state comprehensive emergency management plan & county emergency management plans; prohibits certain public entities from holding specified meetings during declared state of emergency under certain circumstances; requires DOT to conduct study & provides requirements therefor; requires DOT to submit report to Governor & Legislature by specified date; provides that act fulfills important state interest.
Title
Emergency Management
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | House Government Accountability Committee | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] | Rep. Katie Edwards [D] |
Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time 736 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-22 | House | CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/22/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1109 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S1466 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S1466 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 559 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
252 | 375 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |