FL S1456 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 754
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 754
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides exemptions from public records requirements for personal identifying information of an enrollee or participant in the Florida Health Choices Program, client and customer lists of buyers' representatives which are held by Florida Health Choices, Inc., and proprietary confidential business information of vendors which is held by Florida Health Choices, Inc. Provides for disclosure of such confidential and exempt information to certain persons and entities upon written request. Provides for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions, etc.
Title
Public Records/Florida Health Choices
Sponsors
Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Rene Garcia [R] | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -SJ 754 | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on Consent Calendar, 05/03/11 | |
2011-04-26 | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time -SJ 486 | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-15 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-14 | CS/CS by- Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/14/11, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-06 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 323 | |
2011-04-05 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-04 | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 270 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 165 | |
2011-02-28 | Filed |