FL S1450 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing eligible organizations to receive a refund of a specified amount of certain sales taxes collected if such amount is used for certain purposes; specifying the annual maximum allowable tax refund for such organizations; authorizing the Department of Economic Opportunity to certify organizations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Refund for Eligible Job Training Organizations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time 724
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-01-31SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-01-31SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-29SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1231 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212099Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback