FL S1450 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the Technology Program within the Department of Management Services to expedite implementation of a text-to-911 technology in the state; directing the office to use information identified in a specified report to assist public agencies and voice communications services providers in implementing the technology, etc.
Title
Text-to-911 Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H503 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1450 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1450/BillText/Filed/HTML |