FL S1446 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for criminal or civil intelligence or investigative information, or any other information, held by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services as part of an investigation with another state or federal regulatory, administrative, or criminal justice agency; providing exceptions to the public records exemption; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-27SenateLaid on Table
2015-04-27SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 997 (Vetoed by Governor)
2015-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-08SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2015-04-07SenateCS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2015-04-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/08/15
2015-04-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-03SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-04-02SenateCS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-25SenateNow in Rules
2015-03-24SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2015-03-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-23SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2015-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/23/15, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-03-16SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2015-03-16SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2015-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/16/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-03-03SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2015-02-26SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1444 (Related) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
H0997 (Similar To) 2015-06-18 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
H0995 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
570077Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback