FL H0997 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for criminal or civil intelligence or investigative information or any other information held by DACS as part of investigation with another state or federal regulatory, administrative, or criminal justice agency; provides exceptions to exemption; provides applicability; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity; provides for contingent effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#310 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18HouseVeto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
2015-06-16 Vetoed by Governor
2015-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-27HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-27SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-27SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1446
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-27SenateWithdrawn from Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-13HouseCS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-13HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-09HouseCS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2015-04-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/09/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-26HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-25HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-24HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-11HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2015-03-10HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-03-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB
2015-03-03HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0995 (Related) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S1446 (Similar To) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table
S1444 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
570077Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback