FL S1434 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefining the term "health insurer" as "utilization review entity" and revising the definition; requiring utilization review entities to establish and offer a prior authorization process for accepting electronic prior authorization requests; specifying additional requirements and procedures for, and restrictions and limitations on, utilization review entities relating to prior authorization for covered health care benefits, etc.
Title
Prior Authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Simon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1533 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1434 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1434/BillText/Filed/HTML |