FL S1426 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the rights to which every victim is entitled; specifying rights that a victim may elect to exercise by providing notice to a state attorney or a law enforcement agency; prohibiting the questioning of a victim regarding certain sexual conduct; specifying that victims have a right to be informed of their rights; providing for enforcement and protection of a victim's right to a prompt and final conclusion of a case and any relating proceedings, etc.
Title
Victim Rights
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
945 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
958 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 0011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 0012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 0013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 0014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 0015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 0016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 0017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 0018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 0021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1426 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1426/BillText/Filed/HTML |