FL S1424 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to provide for the election of the Secretary of State and the inclusion of the secretary as a member of the Cabinet, etc.
Title
Election of Secretary of State/Membership of Cabinet
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/24/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/16/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/02/16, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1129 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1424 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1424/BillText/Filed/HTML |