FL S1418 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing requirements for the use of manual physical restraint by school personnel; prohibiting specified manual physical restraint techniques; requiring that each school district develop policies and procedures governing the authorized use of manual physical restraint, the personnel authorized to use such restraint, training procedures, analysis of data, and the reduction of the use of manual physical restraint, etc.
Title
Seclusion and Restraint of Students with Disabilities in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Education |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1418 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1418/BillText/Filed/HTML |