FL S1414 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the COVID-19 Relief Cash Flow Loan Program for the purpose of assisting small businesses impacted by the COVID-19 pandemic in making timely payments to continue operating; providing eligibility requirements for receiving a cash flow loan; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to provide certain information and instructions, administer the loans, distribute loan funds, and deposit repaid funds into the Budget Stabilization Fund, subject to certain requirements, etc.
Title
COVID-19 Relief Cash Flow Loan Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1277 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1414 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1414/BillText/Filed/HTML |