FL S1408 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises an exemption from public meetings requirements which authorizes a board or commission of a state agency, authority, county, municipal corporation, or political subdivision and the chief administrative or executive officer of such governmental entity to meet in private with the entity's attorney to discuss pending litigation. Includes within the exemption a public employee or agent having relevant information needed by the entity's attorney, etc.
Title
Public Meetings/Pending Litigation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 322 | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/04/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 106 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary -SJ 106 | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1065 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1408 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1408/BillText/Filed/HTML |