FL H1065 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises exception to public meetings law that allows specified governmental entities & chief administrative or executive officers thereof to meet in private with entity's attorney to discuss specified pending litigation; expands exception to include public employees or agents who possess relevant information needed by entity's attorney among those authorized to attend such private meeting; revises condition precedent to such private meeting; provides for legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Meetings/Discussions of Pending Litigation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-10 Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 210
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 93
2011-03-01 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
286011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback