FL S1406 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person operating a motor vehicle on an expressway from being charged a toll if the average speed of traffic on the expressway falls below 40 miles per hour; defining the term "expressway", etc.
Title
Expressway Tolls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1069 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1406 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1406/BillText/Filed/HTML |