FL S1394 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that local building code administrators and inspectors and firesafety marshals and inspectors do not have discretionary authority to change certain building plans under specified circumstances, etc.
Title
Building Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1394 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1394/BillText/Filed/HTML |